Financial history PARK GROVE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1076368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.58k £12.80k £12.60k £5.71k £3.20k
Total expenditure £12.02k £11.99k £9.07k £4.02k £7.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A