Financial history 4 CHARITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1077143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £535.01k £517.58k £255.36k £157.68k £167.80k
Total expenditure £5.38m £4.16m £1.19m £2.63m £742.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £535.01k £517.58k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.13m £4.16m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £242.65k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £28.31k £46.74k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.05m £4.08m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £242.65k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A