Accounts and annual returns THE IHR TRUST

Charity number: 1077592
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 July 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 July 2022 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 January 2022 242 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 28 January 2022 242 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 June 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 June 2019 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window