Financial history THE IHR TRUST

Charity number: 1077592
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £880.42k £359.39k £99.36k £124.44k £50.85k
Total expenditure £220.20k £534.67k £144.81k £305.51k £249.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £877.12k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £3.30k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £675.16k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £204.99k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £150 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A