Trustees THE IHR TRUST

Charity number: 1077592
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alice Prochaska Chair
GENERAL FEDERATION OF TRADE UNIONS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: 2 days late
Professor Claire Langhamer Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Michael Griffiths Trustee 08 March 2021
None on record
Dr John Mc Loughlin Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
Frances Illingworth Trustee 27 May 2020
None on record
Professor Mary Vincent Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Nicola Ralston Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Elaine De'Ath Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record