PLANTNETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity organises training workshops for staff in public gardens; and promotes botanical collections in Britain and Ireland as a resource for research, conservation and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 July 2000: Standard registration
- PLANTNETWORK: THE PLANT COLLECTIONS NETWORK OF (Working name)
- PLANTNET (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Crook | Chair | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benedict Edwin Carey Lyte MSc | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Alexandra Anderson Langley | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darach Lupton | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Suzanne Moss | Trustee | 09 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Thomas | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Scott Brent | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Esseen | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Piers Horry | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Steele | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natalie CHIVERS | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Herrington | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Jane Burnley | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.25k | £41.58k | £68.67k | £55.55k | £45.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.93k | £41.16k | £35.88k | £50.33k | £64.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 28 JUNE 2000 AND AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HORTICULTURE AND RELATED SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF PLANT COLLECTIONS AND THEIR MANAGEMENT AND CONSERVATION (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE GENERAL PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF PLANT COLLECTIONS OF IMPORTANCE BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gravita
Park Central
40-41 Park End Street
OXFORD
OX1 1JD
- Phone:
- 07778 722237
- Email:
- office@plantnetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window