Accounts and annual returns K.E. SMITH CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 1076520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required