WEST END REFUGEE SERVICE (WERS)

Charity number: 1077601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £304.02k £314.37k £267.17k £265.66k £255.27k
Total expenditure £272.34k £294.94k £261.88k £244.40k £285.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £21.00k £45.00k £68.00k