THE A TEAM FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1077094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 16 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 09 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 09 December 2016 On time Download