FIFTY PLUS AGED ERITREAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1077984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required