TRIALOGUE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1076660
Charity reporting is up to date

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Through the "Club of Three", the Trialogue Educational Trust works with leaders in government, business, civil society and academia in France, Germany, the UK and across Europe in order to develop cross-border responses to the major geo-strategic, social and economic challenges of our time. All other work was transferred to the Institute for Strategic Dialogue (charity number 1141069) in 2016.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £123,134
Total expenditure: £137,027
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • France
  • Germany

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 July 1999 : registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CLUB OF THREE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Fraser Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
Rowan Alexander Barnett Trustee 06 March 2018 None on record
LORD TURNER OF ECCHINSWELL Trustee
INET FOUNDATION (UK) Charity reporting is up to date
Michael Maclay Chair 19 December 2016 None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.95k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £2.11m £2.17m £308.48k £159.05k £123.13k
Total expenditure £2.14m £2.77m £278.12k £153.85k £137.03k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 03 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
Office One
1 Coldbath Square
Farringdon, London
EC1R 5HL
Phone:
020 3925 3992