SCENE AND HEARD

Charity number: 1077836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 10 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 10 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 17 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time Download