SCENE AND HEARD

Charity number: 1077836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £215.35k £151.45k £198.53k £231.50k £285.76k
Total expenditure £161.75k £166.25k £180.75k £197.81k £223.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £977 £0 N/A N/A N/A