Trustees THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1076618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Hugh Westland Pilcher Chair 13 March 2012
None on record
KEITH ALEXANDER MARCHAND EDMUNDS Trustee 27 March 2020
GRACE CHURCH, MUSWELL HILL
Received: On time
CAROLINE MARGARET PELLEREAU Trustee 05 July 2017
None on record
Nicholas Cecil John Bewes Trustee 30 November 2016
SHELFORD GOSPEL TRUST
Received: On time
THE LIVERPOOL GOSPEL TRUST
Received: On time
Jeremy David Bruce Anderson Trustee 21 March 2014
None on record