REFUGEE WORKERS' CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 02 February 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2017 2 days late Download