Financial history REFUGEE WORKERS' CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £45.74k £56.01k £59.75k £207.27k £122.51k
Total expenditure £50.97k £53.61k £55.84k £161.85k £117.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A