Accounts and annual returns ST ROBERTS PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080992
Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required