PAKISTAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION (SWINDON)

Charity number: 1079453
Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our main regular activities are: Advice Work, Admin, Educational Classes for the Pakistani/Asian community in Swindon. Liaising and working with local voluntary groups/ local authorities for mutual causes within wider community within Swindon & Wiltshire.. We also focus on development for culture and arts for all ages. Helping disadvantaged children and the disabled/elderly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012

Total income: £1,640
Total expenditure: £1,640

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Swindon
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ARIF QURESHI Chair
None on record
IMRAN KHAN Trustee
JAMIA MOHAMMADIA
Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days
MOHAMMAD SALAS KHAN Trustee
JAMIA MOHAMMADIA
Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days
AZIZUL HUSSAIN Trustee
None on record
AFTAB SHAH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £3.27k £3.43k £5.48k £2.54k £1.64k
Total expenditure £3.12k £3.55k £5.48k £2.54k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1572 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 ANGLER ROAD
SHAW
SWINDON
SN5 5SX
Phone:
01793346313
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available