THE WIGAN CHURCHES ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY WELFARE

Charity number: 1076830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £673.35k £756.96k £821.12k £890.44k £823.42k
Total expenditure £648.54k £702.88k £795.06k £824.49k £799.76k
Income from government contracts £293.60k £293.60k £437.55k £323.77k £487.46k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £8.08k £7.36k £3.79k £3.39k £849
Income - Other trading activities £298 £531 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £745.58k £816.34k £885.78k £820.72k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.23k £1.26k £1.00k £1.27k £1.85k
Income - Other £662.75k £2.23k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £702.88k £795.06k £824.49k £799.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £114.42k £115.73k £122.64k £118.60k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £534.12k £0 £0 £0 £0