ITESO WELFARE ASSOCIATION ( IWA )

Charity number: 1078300
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Iteso Welfare Association is in the business of nurturing development awareness, empowering and developing disadvantaged/vulnerable communities in the UK and Africa. These responsive activities aim to achieve positive citizenship, life learning, a healthy community and encourage community participation. IWA also provides translation and project evaluation services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017

Total income: £30,043
Total expenditure: £30,199

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Kenya
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 1999: Standard registration
  • 22 January 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 22 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1170126 ITESO WELFARE ASSOCIATION ( IWA )
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • IWA (UK) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £110 £207 £207 £7.62k £30.04k
Total expenditure £692 £605 £605 £6.42k £30.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 20 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required