Trustees BRAZILIAN ATLANTIC RAINFOREST TRUST

Charity number: 1079038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FRANK SIMON BURY Chair 19 November 2019
THE MILLICHOPE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Edward Makin Trustee 16 April 2025
None on record
Katherine Cunningham Trustee 19 November 2024
None on record
Stuart David Housden OBE Trustee 08 November 2017
None on record
WILLIAM ECCLES Trustee 05 April 2016
None on record
Kim Stewart Trustee 27 June 2013
None on record
ROBERT BERNARD LOCKE Trustee
None on record
LINDSAY CLAUDE NEILS BURY Trustee
THE MILLICHOPE FOUNDATION
Received: On time