ISLAMIC AID

Charity number: 1078489
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £4.20m £4.20m £3.79m £4.37m £4.31m
Total expenditure £3.80m £3.80m £4.94m £1.73m £2.39m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.71m £3.71m £3.20m £3.04m £3.26m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £62.91k £62.91k £63.64k £1.66k £2.25k
Income - Other £423.08k £423.08k £524.61k £1.32m £1.05m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.51m £3.51m £4.71m £1.37m £1.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £202.88k £202.88k £162.07k £265.09k £276.83k
Expenditure - Governance £26.16k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £81.01k £81.01k £71.07k £100.92k £147.70k