THE FURNEUX PELHAM CHURCH RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1076766
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 214 days
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 14 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 03 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required