Financial history BLUE ELEPHANT THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1077161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £142.29k £185.83k £203.55k £228.64k £223.97k
Total expenditure £149.76k £161.93k £193.18k £186.30k £195.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £32.02k £26.00k £21.00k £23.16k £22.00k