Friends of Stalham Schools

Charity number: 1076748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.52k £6.20k £6.69k £7.48k £5.46k
Total expenditure £5.53k £5.06k £6.50k £6.78k £5.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A