RELATE MID WILTSHIRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relate Mid Wiltshire works to encourage respect and fulfilment in all relationships, particularly couple and family relationshps, thus promoting individual well-being throughout mid Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 April 2000: Standard registration
- 03 May 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RELATE MID WILTSHIRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £521.12k | £570.33k | £519.09k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £487.99k | £526.25k | £526.06k | £105.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.00k | £110.49k | £35.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.00k | £12.00k | £32.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £487 | £1.37k | £31 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.39k | £1.92k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £519.03k | £566.85k | £518.97k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £217 | £196 | £90 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £487.33k | £525.65k | £526.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £660 | £605 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.95k | £0 | £13.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 March 2020 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2003, 3 OCTOBER 2008, AND DATED 23 OCTOBER 2009 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 16 DECEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE; 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH; 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR - 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
KENNET, NORTH WILTSHIRE AND WEST WILTSHIRE DISTRICTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window