Financial history THE BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS

Charity number: 1085760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £19.52m £21.42m £20.84m £20.08m £19.97m
Total expenditure £19.99m £19.99m £22.44m £23.11m £20.95m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.18m £21.13m £20.61m £19.82m £19.79m
Income - Other trading activities £89.78k £46.60k £51.29k £44.21k £58.84k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £246.51k £241.62k £186.07k £199.40k £123.67k
Income - Other £0 £9.60k £1.70k £12.49k £35
Income - Legacies £10.12m £11.49m £10.41m £10.20m £931.01k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.73m £13.31m £15.24m £16.00m £13.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.21m £6.68m £7.20m £7.12m £7.21m
Expenditure - Governance £193.96k £162.68k £183.45k £149.88k £127.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.45m £5.94m £7.34m £7.54m £5.51m
Expenditure - Investment management £89.09k £83.21k £90.00k £91.58k £89.36k
Expenditure - Other £52.69k £0 £0 £0 £0