Trustees THE BROOKE HOSPITAL FOR ANIMALS

Charity number: 1085760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Isobel Hayes Chair 23 September 2020
None on record
Dr Linda Belton Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Amy Jankiewicz Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Dr Zoe Raw Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Christopher John Tattersall Trustee 04 December 2019
None on record
Mark Hugh McLaughlin Trustee 27 June 2019
UNITED RESPONSE
Received: On time
Rajat Dhawan Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Heather Jane Killen Trustee 27 June 2019
None on record
Gaynor Miller Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Professor Cheikh Ly Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record
Dr Belinda Bennet Trustee 12 October 2016
None on record