Accounts and annual returns Brian Mercer Trust

Charity number: 1076925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 06 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 06 February 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window