Financial history Brian Mercer Trust

Charity number: 1076925
Charity reporting is up to date (36 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £1.19m £1.22m £1.29m £1.32m £1.32m
Total expenditure £1.05m £971.04k £354.07k £1.06m £1.10m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.19m £1.22m £1.29m £1.32m £1.32m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £922.44k £841.94k £218.03k £919.13k £938.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds £129.39k £129.10k £136.04k £144.03k £156.80k
Expenditure - Governance £20.96k £21.11k £20.95k £23.35k £20.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £901.48k £820.83k £197.07k £895.78k £918.21k
Expenditure - Investment management £129.39k £129.10k £136.04k £144.03k £156.80k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0