Financial history RUTH SMART FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1080021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £161.46k £175.78k £151.93k £149.01k £130.36k
Total expenditure £190.03k £254.09k £234.91k £258.04k £238.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A