THE ANDREW CROFT MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 1078106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £15.44k £42.66k £7.49k £18.68k £16.45k
Total expenditure £6.14k £8.39k £10.49k £5.22k £4.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A