BHAARAT WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1077821
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 905 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 174 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 174 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 540 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 905 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 905 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 January 2017 On time Download