WESTONIA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1078163
Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 100 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 466 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 466 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 June 2018 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required