WESTONIA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1078163
Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £4.27k £4.42k £3.96k £4.90k £3.45k
Total expenditure £1.27k £1.04k £180 £204 £204
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A