Trustees BARNSLEY & DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1077654
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Bacon | Chair | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Mary Embury | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marie Dew | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Buttling | Trustee | 07 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN STOKES | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niall Clarke | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Indu Kumar | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Kasparek | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Atkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Northcut | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.