LONDON MANDARIN NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1077219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 June 2020 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 April 2019 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required