LONDON MANDARIN NORTH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1077219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Elliott Trustee 01 December 2018 None on record
Giancarlo SEMERARO Trustee 24 January 2015 None on record
Simon Achonu Trustee 30 September 2018 None on record
Elliot Firoz Trustee 31 March 2018 None on record
REUBEN BRADDOCK Chair None on record
SIMON CUBBIN Trustee 01 February 2013 None on record
Simone Rozzi Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
Marco Leva Trustee 31 March 2018 None on record