HODDLESDEN MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintains Millennium Green. Organises events on the Green, (Summer Picnic on the Green with musical entertainment and games for all).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 01 October 1999: Standard registration
- HODDLESDEN MGT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher McIlveen | Chair | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jane Gilmore Harris | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Wild | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Gleave | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA SADLER REG. NURSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.55k | £2.81k | £2.07k | £125.33k | £1.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.31k | £3.66k | £2.68k | £4.17k | £77.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN AN OPEN SPACE TO BE KNOWN AS HODDLESDEN MILLENNIUM GREEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND TO BE USED FOREVER AS AN AREA FOR INFORMAL RECREATION OR PLAY AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS A MEETING PLACE OR PLACE FOR COMMUNITY EVENTS AND FOR ANY OTHER LAWFUL PURPOSE
Area of benefit
HODDLESDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Glenshiels Avenue
Hoddlesden
Darwen
BB3 3LS
- Phone:
- 01254773990
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window