Financial history ISLINGTON PEOPLE'S RIGHTS

Charity number: 1077688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £423.15k £412.65k £472.05k £451.81k £674.86k
Total expenditure £437.06k £408.72k £448.35k £504.29k £599.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £230.00k
Income from government grants £245.00k £230.00k £230.00k £230.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.07k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £639.74k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £54
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £586.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.41k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.69k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0