Trustees ISLINGTON PEOPLE'S RIGHTS

Charity number: 1077688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HENRIETTA COOKE Chair 11 November 2014
None on record
Tiong An Chua Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Mohammed Yaseen Pandor Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
David James Alexander Amos Trustee 10 November 2020
None on record
Elizabeth Ward Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record
Saiqa Pandor Trustee 04 December 2018
None on record
DAVID MOORE Trustee 06 March 2018
3RD STAINES SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
BAHAR CHOUDHARY Trustee 08 December 2015
None on record
JOANNA GIVENS Trustee 11 November 2014
None on record
OMOTOYOSI AKINFEMIWA Trustee 26 November 2013
None on record
ARTHUR RYSER Trustee
None on record
KRISHAN MURARI Trustee
None on record