THE DEREK BAILEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The DBF returned to Nyofelleh to restore the clinic, staff quarters, ambulance & school .We have had a successful maintenance program meeting Ministers of Health and Education who are very pleased with our progress. The Minister of Health signed an MOU with the DBF to fund a midwife completely,the DBF will provide a new Maternity Unit.and accommodation for the nurse , our target this year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- The Gambia
Governance
- 22 February 2000: Standard registration
- THE DEREK BAILEY FOUNDATION (NYOFELLEH) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Bailey | Chair |
|
|
|||||
OUSMAN Jatta Mr | Trustee | 18 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE PAYNE | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
FAMARA DEMBA | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAWN MANSFIELD | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN MANSFIELD | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Bojang | Trustee | 17 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
FAY CRAWSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TERRY CRAWSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.82k | £3.40k | £446 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £4.10k | £1.28k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 07 September 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 20 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THE PEOPLE OF NYOFELLEH AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN THE GAMBIA.
Area of benefit
NYOFELLEH AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN THE GAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clock Tower Flat
Yeldersley Hall
Derby Road
Yeldersley
ASHBOURNE
DE6 1LS
- Phone:
- 01335347012
- Email:
- BAILEYJ@BAILEYJ.ENTADSL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window