LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1078271
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Craig Ewan Shevas Trustee 09 May 2017
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
CHERYL PHAROAH Trustee 05 December 2012
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
ALDERMAN NEWTON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
ANTHONY HENRY JARVIS Trustee
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FRAMEWORK KNITTERS EDUCATION CHARITY Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
Professor Surinder Mohan Sharma DL Trustee 01 August 2017
LEICESTER ARTS CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
NATIONAL SPACE CENTRE Received: 26 days late
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
CLIVE EDMUND SMITH Chair 12 December 2012
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
THE HARRY JAMES RIDDLESTON CHARITY OF LEICESTER Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER THOMAS SAUL Trustee 09 May 2017
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE AND RUTLAND LIMITED Received: On time
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
AGE UK LEICESTER SHIRE & RUTLAND HOME HELP LIMITED Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time
George Oliver Trustee 05 February 2019
LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY Received: On time
LEICESTER LITERARY AND PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
R. DAPHNE PLUNKET CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE MANSION TRUST (UK ) Received: On time
LEICESTER INDIGENT OLD AGE SOCIETY Received: On time