SAHIR HOUSE

Charity number: 1077327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time Download