SAHIR HOUSE

Charity number: 1077327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £501.13k £586.30k £555.85k £481.88k £529.34k
Total expenditure £472.52k £526.18k £537.53k £538.56k £471.45k
Income from government contracts £204.62k £335.74k £299.19k £305.47k £283.17k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £13.15k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £18.83k £40.88k £18.61k N/A £62.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £482.18k £544.62k £536.54k N/A £466.52k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £119 £803 £700 N/A £335
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £57.59k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £469.50k £525.74k £535.69k N/A £471.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.03k £438 £1.84k N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.73k £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0