PAROLE DE FOI

Charity number: 1079424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £162.14k £161.64k £153.86k £163.17k £154.57k
Total expenditure £150.56k £158.96k £147.05k £153.35k £166.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.05k