Accounts and annual returns HIS PRESENCE TEMPLE MINISTRY

Charity number: 1077396
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 200 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 200 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window