THE LYN AND JEFFREY PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1078751
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 OCTOBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTS SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST FIRST TO PAY FROM IT ALL PROPER COSTS AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ADMINISTERING THE CHARITY AND THE TRUST FUND AND SUBJECT TO THAT TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME AND [IF AND WHEN THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT] THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT OR OBJECTS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO SUPPORT OR ESTABLISH
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 24 December 1999 : registered
  • 16 September 2009 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
  • 02 October 2009 : registered
  • 09 September 2013 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
Other names
  • THE LYN AND JEFFERY PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
  • THE PHILLIPS FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance