Trustees NOCN
Charity number: 1079785

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Jones | Chair | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Wilkins | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jayne Davis | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Evans | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Lucy Hunte | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Macaskill | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Toomey | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
CORRINA HEMBURY | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kay Dickinson | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Alison Duckles CBE | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.