DEVELOPING HEALTH AND INDEPENDENCE

Charity number: 1078154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.76m £4.52m £5.96m £5.58m £6.05m
Total expenditure £4.81m £4.18m £4.63m £5.37m £5.56m
Income from government contracts £4.29m £4.21m £4.67m £5.00m £3.44m
Income from government grants £106.19k £0 £1.12m N/A £15.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £11.53k £5.96k £3.75k £6.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.75m £4.48m £5.95m £5.57m £6.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.96k £12.34k £9.71k £3.80k £16.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.81m £4.18m £4.63m £5.33m £4.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £43.60k £654.52k
Expenditure - Governance £22.47k £16.48k £16.70k £15.68k £20.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £968 £646.88k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0